Ladouceur, Jessica (CPSO#: 100440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville Queen's University
Family Medicine Centre
145 Station Street, Unit 207
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9
Phone: (613) 771-1910 Ext. 5
Fax: 613-771-3396
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ladouceur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ladouceur ( CPSO# 100440)

Business Address:
Belleville Queen's University
Family Medicine Centre
Unit 207
145 Station Street
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9
Phone Number: (613) 771-1910

Business Address:
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA LADOUCEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LADOUCEUR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015