Laevski, Hristo Lefter (CPSO#: 69761)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:ST CYRIL AND METHODIUS UNIVERSITY, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2000 to 22 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Jan 2000 to 22 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Jan 2001 to 31 Jul 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2002