Lafleche, Jean Pierre (CPSO#: 32987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 746-6745
Fax: (613) 746-6008
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean Pierre Lafleche Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lafleche ( CPSO# 32987 )
Dr. C. Bishop ( CPSO# 30144 )

Business Address:
202 - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 746-6745

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN PIERRE LAFLECHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFLECHE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1981