Lafleur, Jules Richard (CPSO#: 19472)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Oct 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
189 Hymus Boulevard
Pointe Claire QC  H9R 1E9
Phone: (514) 695-5993
Fax: (514) 695-3807
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

151 Main East
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1A1
Canada
Phone: (613) 632-4505
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULES RICHARD LAFLEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFLEUR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Nov 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1982