Lafond, Guy Paul (CPSO#: 31878)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 16 Sep 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Feb 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003