Laframboise, Stephane (CPSO#: 62525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Room M-715
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2254
Fax: (416) 946-2288
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Opg Princess Margaret Cancer Center
Suite 6-913
700 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-2254
Fax: (416) 946-2288
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephane Laframboise Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Laframboise ( CPSO# 62525 )

Business Address:
OPG 700 University Avenue
Suite 6-913
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone Number: (416) 946-2254

Business Address:
Ontario Cancer Institute
Princess Margaret Hospital
M-715 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2254

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANE LAFRAMBOISE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFRAMBOISE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991