Lafreniere, Gabrielle (CPSO#: 110947)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 29 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 2017