Lafreniere, Lynn Margaret (CPSO#: 83952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar
Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Institute Of Cosmetic & Laser
Surgery
1344 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7W5
Canada
Phone: (905) 842-2262
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Centre for Personal Surgery
520 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 634-5573
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L.M. Lafreniere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lafreniere ( CPSO# 83952 )

Business Address:
100 - 1344 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7W5
Phone Number: (905) 842-2262

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
520 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V2
Phone Number: (905) 634-5573

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 02 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNN MARGARET LAFRENIERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFRENIERE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2007