Lago, Suzana Cardona (CPSO#: 77082)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2001 to 31 Jul 2002
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2003