Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lagrotteria, Lino Pasquale (CPSO#: 56943)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 800
723 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON  L9B 2W2
Phone: (905) 574-1116
Fax: (905) 574-2283
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lino Lagrotteria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lagrotteria ( CPSO# 56943 )

Business Address:
800 - 723 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON  L9B 2W2
Phone Number: (905) 574-1115

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINO PASQUALE LAGROTTERIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAGROTTERIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1988