Lai, Enoch Kam Yiu (CPSO#: 76585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Alberta, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6186
Fax: (416) 756-6095
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 633-9420
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Enoch K.Y. Lai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lai ( CPSO# 76585 )

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6186

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ENOCH KAM YIU LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001