Lai, Garming Elliot (CPSO#: 90688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1466 Bathurst Street
Suite 205
Toronto ON  M5R3S3
Phone: (416) 483-8111
Fax: 416-483-8182
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Lai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lai ( CPSO# 90688 )

Business Address:
205 - 1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 483-8111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARMING ELLIOT LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011