Lai, Ho-Yin (CPSO#: 65513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone: (905) 677-6532
Fax: (905) 677-6533
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ho-Yin Lai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lai ( CPSO# 65513 )

Business Address:
107 - 3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone Number: (905) 677-6532

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HO-YIN LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993