Lai, Paul Fat Sang (CPSO#: 68117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone: (905) 671-1052
Fax: (905) 671-8489
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2296 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2M2
Canada
Phone: (416) 615-0002
Fax: (416) 285-1169
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL FAT SANG LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996