Lai, Philip (CPSO#: 82997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
2520 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2
Phone: (905) 825-0549
Fax: (905) 827-0080
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip Lai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lai ( CPSO# 82997 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
2520 Posmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2
Phone Number: (905) 825-0549

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010