Lai, Robert Soe-Hlaing (CPSO#: 64029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1992

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Urology Center of Hot Springs
1900 Malvern Avenue
Suite 302
Hot Springs AR  71901
United States
Phone: 501 623-2304
Fax: 501 623-2331

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arkansas
USA - Illinois
USA - Indiana
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 17 May 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT SOE-HLAING LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On January 17, 2012, at The Circuit Court of Cook County in Chicago, Illinois, a finding of Malpractice was made against Dr. Lai.