Lai, Wendy Angela (CPSO#: 78996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: Lai, Wendy (used until: 22 Jun 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto, ON M3M 0B2
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 42000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

146 Oliver Street
Campbellford ON  K0L1L0
Canada
Phone: 7056531140
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY ANGELA LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2005