Lailey, Jennifer Ann (CPSO#: 69949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
126 South May Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 1B3
Phone: (807) 623-3929 Ext. 3
Fax: (807) 622-5633
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakehead University
Student Health and Counselling
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Canada
Phone: (807) 343-8361
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lailey Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stewart ( CPSO# 69939 )
Dr. J. Lailey ( CPSO# 69949 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
126 May Street South
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 1B3
Phone Number: (807) 623-3929

Business Address:
Lakehead University Student Health
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone Number: (807) 343-8361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN LAILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAILEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998