Laing, Alan Ross (CPSO#: 22329)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Oct 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Oct 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 Sep 2013
Summary:

 On September 4, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Alan Ross Laing committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. 
 Dr. Laing admitted the allegation. 

Dr. Laing failed to maintain the standard of practice with 
 respect to 25 patients, and exposed his patients to risk of harm, based on various deficiencies in 
 his psychotherapy practice, including substandard record keeping, substandard care and boundary 
 violations. 

Dr. Laing has executed an undertaking to the College by which, among other things, 
 he resigns his membership in the College effective October 10, 2013, undertakes never to apply or 
 reapply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction 
 after that date, and will be subject to continued supervision of his practice until his 
 resignation takes effect.  
The Committee ordered and directed that:

(	Dr. Laing attend before 
 the panel to be reprimanded
(	Dr. Laing pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within 
 thirty (30) days of the date of this Order

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 4, 2013


Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 11 Apr 1995
Summary:

 On April 11, 1995, a panel of the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Alan Ross Laing to be an 
 incapacitated member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario as defined in subsection 
 1 (1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions 
 Act, 1991, and ordered that a set of conditions be imposed on Dr. Laing(s certificate of 
 registration.  On August 27, 1997, a panel of the Fitness to Practise Committee ordered the 
 removal of the conditions imposed pursuant to its order of April 11, 1995.

Appeal: Notice of Appeal

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 10, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Alan Ross Laing to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Department):

I, Dr. Laing:

(2) Acknowledge and agree that the College referred allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence to the Discipline Committee in a Notice of Hearing dated April 18, 2012 (the “Notice of Hearing”).

(3) Hereby resign from the College effective October 10, 2013 (the “Effective Date”).

(4) Hereby undertake never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

(6) Undertake to the College that no later than 30 days before the Effective Date, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the Effective Date.

(8) Give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide information resulting in this Undertaking and any Discipline Committee order, decision, reasons, or exhibits relating to the discipline proceeding against me regarding the allegations set out in the Notice of Hearing to any Clinical Supervisors approved under my Clinical Supervision Undertaking.

(9) Give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors approved under my Clinical Supervision Undertaking to disclose to the College, and to one another, all information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.

(10) Give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.

(11) Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.