Laique, Firdous Raees (CPSO#: 76806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Urdu

Education:King Faisal University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
7777 Hennessey Boulevard
Baton Rouge LA  70808
United States
Phone: (225) 767-6700

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Louisiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FIRDOUS RAEES LAIQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAIQUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2003