Lajoie, Julie Jacqueline Mary (CPSO#: 77951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Ave East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE JACQUELINE MARY LAJOIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAJOIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 25 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 26 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 05 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 06 Jun 2006 to 05 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 06 Jun 2007 to 05 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2008