Lajoie, Lucie (CPSO#: 73554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 1630
20260 County Road 43
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Phone: (613) 525-0161
Fax: (613) 525-0159
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lucie Lajoie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lajoie ( CPSO# 73554 )

Business Address:
20260 County Road 43
P.O. Box 1630
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 525-0161

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCIE LAJOIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAJOIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 04 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 05 Feb 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2001 to 07 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2002