Lakatoo Hunt, Sophia Julie (CPSO#: 84344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: Lakatoo, Sophia Julie (used until: 11 Jul 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHIA JULIE LAKATOO HUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKATOO HUNT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 19 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 20 May 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 08 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2017