Lakhani, Aly (CPSO#: 87271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Aga Khan University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
298 John Street
Unit 3
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone: (905) 482-8648
Fax: (905) 482-8647
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
8 East - General Internal Medicine
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Fax: (416) 603-6495
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aly Lakhani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lakhani ( CPSO# 87271 )

Business Address:
8E - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
14EN Room 208A
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
298 John Street
Unit 3
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone Number: (905) 482-8648

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALY LAKHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2009