Lakhanpal, Pulkesh (CPSO#: 69360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 531-2266
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pulkesh Lakhanpal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 4 2006


Corporation Name: Pulkesh Lakhanpal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 14 2008


Corporation Name: Dr. Pulkesh Lakhanpal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lakhanpal ( CPSO# 69360 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 531-2266

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PULKESH LAKHANPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKHANPAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Oct 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 May 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2006