Lakhian, Shamsher Kaur (CPSO#: 56025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 1993

Summary

Former Name: Toor, Shamsher Kaur (used until: 18 Jul 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1850
1820 Preston Park Boulevard
Plano TX  75093
United States
Phone: (972) 867-4658
Fax: (972) 867-8696

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAMSHER KAUR LAKHIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKHIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1993