Lakoff, Joshua Matthew (CPSO#: 94866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310 Ext. 3212
Fax: (613) 545-2204
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J M Lakoff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lakoff ( CPSO# 94866 )

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 25 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSHUA MATTHEW LAKOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKOFF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2011 to 05 Apr 2011
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 02 Jul 2012 to 25 Jul 2012
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2014