Lakra, Arun (CPSO#: 63969)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 31 Dec 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2011