Lakra, Deepak Chand (CPSO#: 93424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2863 Ellesmere Road - Suite 201
Centenary Hospital Main Atrium
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: 416-840-5747
Fax: 416-840-0247
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deepak C. Lakra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lakra ( CPSO# 93424 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEEPAK CHAND LAKRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2017