Lala, Prateek Kushum (CPSO#: 82297)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Clinical Pharmacology
and Toxicology
555 University Avenue, Room 8227
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2005 to 08 May 2005
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 28 Aug 2006 to 29 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 30 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008