Lalande, Phillip David Nathaniel (CPSO#: 65803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Regional Health Centre
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6H6
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phillip Lalande Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lalande ( CPSO# 65803 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Service
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILLIP DAVID NATHANIEL LALANDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALANDE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1996