Lalani, Amina Pirbhai (CPSO#: 72007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lalani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lalani ( CPSO# 72007 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Emergency Medicine
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-5807

Business Address:
301 - 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 860-6696

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6611

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7174

Business Address:
10323 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C1
Phone Number: (905) 237-4632


Corporation Name: Drs. Chan Flanders Lalani & Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mehta ( CPSO# 71498 )
Dr. A. Lalani ( CPSO# 72007 )
Dr. D. Flanders ( CPSO# 77729 )
Dr. K. Chan ( CPSO# 76358 )

Business Address:
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 860-6696

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMINA PIRBHAI LALANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 1997 to 14 Dec 1997
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2001