Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lalani, Naznin (CPSO#: 32889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centenary After Hours Clinic
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough
Thornhill ON  L3T 2V2
Phone: 416 281 8681
Fax: 416 724 0369
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAZNIN LALANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1981