Laliberte, Jean Julien (CPSO#: 24514)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Mar 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002