Lall, Rosemarie Nadira (CPSO#: 68710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Apr 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Jul 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Platinum Medical FHO
3170 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1J 2H3
Phone: (416) 265-2255
Fax: (416) 265-6737
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosemarie N. Lall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lall ( CPSO# 68710 )

Business Address:
Platinum Medical Clinic FHG
3170 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1J 2H3
Phone Number: (416) 265-2255

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1995
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 25 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 25 Jul 2014 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 25, 2014, the following term, condition and limitation is imposed
            on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Rosemarie Nadira Lall, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Lall has given to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Lall may not perform laser therapy/treatments and may not delegate
                  laser therapy/treatments and/or oversee the performance of laser
                  therapy/treatments.