Lall, Vipin (CPSO#: 61049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2125 Front Road
La Salle ON  N9J 2C1
Phone: (519) 734-1234
Fax: (519) 734-8674
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIPIN LALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1990