Lalla, Ravindra Mahais (CPSO#: 82012)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2004 to 23 Jan 2005
PEAP - Resident - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2005 to 23 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 24 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 25 Feb 2007 to 24 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 25 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009