Lalonde, Francois David (CPSO#: 66706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 508
1310 West Stewart Drive
Orange CA  92868
United States
Phone: (714) 633-2111
Fax: (714) 633-5615
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 230
25982 Pala Drive
Mission Viejo CA  92691
United States
Phone: (949) 600-8800
Fax: (949) 600-8813
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCOIS DAVID LALONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALONDE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1993