Lalonde, Karl-Andre Roger (CPSO#: 73424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 18596
Fax: 613-761-4757
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karl-Andre Lalonde Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ferrand ( CPSO# 71139 )
Dr. K. Lalonde ( CPSO# 73424 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARL-ANDRE ROGER LALONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALONDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004