Lalor, Eoin Andrew George (CPSO#: 67177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Auckland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit LL #5
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 719-3996
Fax: (705) 719-3998
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.A. Lalor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lalor ( CPSO# 67177 )

Business Address:
LL5
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 719-3996

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EOIN ANDREW GEORGE LALOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jul 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2010