Laluck Junior, Bohdan Julius (CPSO#: 71329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital UHN
8 East 419
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 5853
Fax: (416) 603-6495
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bohdan Laluck Jr. Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Laluck Junior ( CPSO# 71329 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital UHN
8 East 419
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5853

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOHDAN JULIUS LALUCK JUNIOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALUCK JUNIOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001