Lam, Andy Shu Cheong (CPSO#: 53998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone: (905) 945-8609
Fax: (905) 945-2019
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andy S. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lam ( CPSO# 53998 )

Business Address:
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 945-8609

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDY SHU CHEONG LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Respiratory Disease

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1985