Lam, Benjamin (CPSO#: 79650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Divison of Neurology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room A421
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4551
Fax: 416-480-4552
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008