Lam, David Bing Wah (CPSO#: 70382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Seniors Mental
Health Outreach Program
Unit 103
5230 South Service Road
Burlington ON  L7L 5K2
Phone: (905) 681-8233
Fax: (905) 681-8628
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D.B.W. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lam ( CPSO# 70382 )

Business Address:
Halton Geriatric Mental
Health Outreach Program
5230 South Service Road
Suite 103
Burlington ON  L7L 5K2
Phone Number: (905) 681-8233

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID BING WAH LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002