Lam, David Diu-Wick (CPSO#: 62054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
240 Alton Towers Circle
Scarborough ON  M1V 3Z3
Phone: (416) 321-6001
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Diu-Wick Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lam ( CPSO# 62054 )

Business Address:
305 - 240 Alton Towers Circle
Scarborough ON  M1V 3Z3
Phone Number: (416) 321-6001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID DIU-WICK LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991