Lam, Heidix Kim Hing (CPSO#: 106753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Marion Wing, 3rd Floor, M314
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trang Thuy Son Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Son ( CPSO# 108090)
Dr. H. Lam ( CPSO# 106753)

Business Address:
5085 McLaughlin Road
Toronto ON  L5R 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 896-0505

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEIDIX KIM HING LAM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LAM is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. LAM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LAM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. LAM shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LAM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LAM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018