Lam, Joyce Nga Hei (CPSO#: 98683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
NHS - St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (905) 704-4435
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 822-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joyce N.H. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lam ( CPSO# 98683 )

Business Address:
NHS - St Catharines Site
Dept. of Critical Care Medicine
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOYCE NGA HEI LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2016