Lam, Ka Lo Carol (CPSO#: 100757)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Room 5426 Black
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KA LO CAROL LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017