Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lam, Lin-Mei Alice (CPSO#: 61203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 901-2
58-62 Queen's Road Central
Peter Building
Central
Central 3175-3000
Hong Kong S A R
Phone: 852 31753000
Fax: 852 31758008

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIN-MEI ALICE LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Non-Ontario Disciplinary Finding:

Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On April 7, 2017, the Medical Council of Hong Kong found Dr. Lin Mei Alice LAM guilty of misconduct in a professional respect. In particular, Dr. Lam was found guilty of sanctioning, acquiescing in or failing to take adequate steps to prevent the use or publication of her name, title, qualifications, photograph and/or interview records or statements, and certain other quotable qualifications, in an advertisement promoting or endorsing a specific product in November 2010. The Council ordered that Dr. Lam’s name be removed from their General Register for one month but with a suspension of such order for one year. The College was notified of this finding by Dr. Lam on June 1, 2017.