Lam, Mandy Hiu Man (CPSO#: 88351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mandy Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lam ( CPSO# 88351 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANDY HIU MAN LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 27 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Oct 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013